EP2123184 - Footwear sole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z-Coil Ltd 116-1801 LG Metro City, 176-30 Yong Ho Dong, Nam-Gu Busan 608776 / KR | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Eun Jae 116-1801 LG Metro City 176-30 Yong Ho Dong Nam Gu 608776, Busan / KR | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Humphreys, Ceris Anne Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Humphreys, Ceris Anne Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09160075.9 | 12.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | KR20080045934 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: KR 20080045934 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2123184 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2123184 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/18, A43B21/30 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A43B13/182 (EP,US);
A43B13/183 (KR);
A43B21/30 (EP,KR,US);
A43B7/32 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schuhsohle | [2009/48] | English: | Footwear sole | [2009/48] | French: | Semelle de chaussure | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 01.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004016144 (GALLEGOS ALVARO Z [US]) [X] 18 * paragraphs [0027] - [0028] - [0 32] - [0035] - [0 41]; figures 1, 3, 10-13 * [A] 1-4; | [XA]EP1815764 (COIL LTD Z [KR]) [X] 18 * paragraphs [0037] , [0 40] - [0044] - [0 46] - [0047]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-4; | [XA]FR876990 (PRETOT ROBERT) [X] 18 * page 3, lines 25-33; figure 7 * [A] 1-4 | by applicant | US2007180773 |