EP2100509 - Method of controlling pathogenic and/or pest damage in plants using a thiabendazole/abamectin containing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/38] | Pesticidal compositions comprising thiabendazole and abamectin | ||
[2011/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watrin, Clifford George Syngenta Crop Protection Inc. 410 Swing Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | 02 /
Zeun, Ronald Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse 4332, Stein / CH | 03 /
Brandl, Franz Syngenta Crop Protection Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058, Basel / CH | 04 /
Oostendorp, Michael Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058, Basel / CH | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
Watrin, Clifford George Syngenta Crop Protection Inc. 410 Swing Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | ||
02 /
Zeun, Ronald Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhause 4332, Stein / CH | |||
03 /
Brandl, Franz Syngenta Crop Protection Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058, Basel / CH | |||
04 /
Oostendorp, Michael Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058, Basel / CH | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/38] | Application number, filing date | 09160654.1 | 02.05.2006 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | GB20050008993 | 03.05.2005 Original published format: GB 0508993 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100509 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100509 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/78, A01N43/90 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N43/52 (US);
A01N43/78 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/32 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/46, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/46, A01N43/78, A01N51/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/36, A01N37/46, A01N43/54, A01N43/78, A01N43/90, A01N51/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/653, A01N37/46, A01N37/50, A01N43/08, A01N43/36, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/76 (US,EP);
A01N43/78, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bekämpfung von Pflanzen-Pathogenen und Schädlingen mittels einer Zusammensetzung enthaltend eine Thiabenzol/Abamectin Mischung | [2011/17] | English: | Method of controlling pathogenic and/or pest damage in plants using a thiabendazole/abamectin containing composition | [2011/17] | French: | Methode pour lutter contre les pathogènes et les nuisibles des plantes utilisant une composition comprenant un mélange thiabendazole/abamectin | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/38] | Pestizid- Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Thiabendazol und Abamectin | ||
Former [2009/38] | Pesticidal compositions comprising thiabendazole and abamectin | ||
Former [2009/38] | Compositions pesticides comprenant du thiabendazole et de l'abamectine | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06724679.3 / EP1885182 | Divisional application(s) | EP10185224.2 / EP2269457 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060724679) is 25.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | IE | 02.05.2012 | LU | 02.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/20] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
IE | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0059074 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 9 *[A] 8,9 | by applicant | EP0059074 | EP0374753 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 |