EP2128243 - Novel strain of the genus Lactobacillus and topical pharmaceutical formulations containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinclair Pharma S.R.L. Viale Restelli, 29 20124 Milano / IT | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mastrodonato, Marco Via E. Boschetti, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09160822.4 | 20.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI00949 | 22.05.2008 Original published format: IT MI20080949 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128243 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A61K35/74 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neuer Stamm aus dem Genus Lactobacillus und topische pharmazeutische Formulierungen damit | [2009/49] | English: | Novel strain of the genus Lactobacillus and topical pharmaceutical formulations containing it | [2009/49] | French: | Nouvelle souche du genre Lactobacillus et formules pharmaceutiques topiques la contenant | [2009/49] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 03.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 19.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5573765 (REINHARD MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * * claims 1,5,6,8-10 * * column 21, lines 27-47 * * example 11 *; | [X]US2004071679 (DE SIMONE CLAUDIO [IT]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] , [0009] , [0012] *; | [X]US6093394 (CHRISOPE GERALD L [US]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, lines 4-13 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 17 * * column 5, lines 13-24 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 7 * * column 9, lines 17-27 *; | [X]WO03080813 (BIFODAN AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-9 * * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 24 * * page 8, lines 9-13 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 2 * * page 14, lines 19-24 * * example 5 *; | [X]WO2006045474 (MEDINOVA AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, lines 23-47 * * page 4, lines 1,2 * * page 6, lines 40-46 * * example 6 * * claims 1,6 *; | [X]WO2005060937 (HANSENS LAB [DK], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, lines 30-32 * * page 3, lines 24-29 * * page 5, lines 13-30 * * page 7; table 1 * * page 8, lines 37-39 * * page 12, lines 8-36 * * page 13, line 8 - page 17, line 20 * | by applicant | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Handbook, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - AKIYOSHI H; KAZUTO Y; FUMISABURO T, "Isolation and characterization of an inhibitory substance against Escherichia coli produced by Lactobacillus acidophilus", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, (1977), vol. 32, pages 727 - 30 | - BOTTAZZI V; FRIEND BA; SHAHANI KM, "Proprieta antitumorali dei batteri lattici e degli alimenti fermentati con batteri lattici", IL LATTE, (1985), vol. 10, pages 873 - 9 | - BINDER HJ; FILBURN B; FLOCH M, "Bile acid inhibition of intestinal anaerobic organisms", AM J CLIN NUTR, (1975), vol. 28, pages 119 - 25 | - BURTON JP; CADIEUX P; REID G, "Improved understanding of the bacterial vaginal microflora of women before and after probiotic instillation", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 69, pages 97 - 101 | - CONWAY P.L.; GORBACH S.L.; GOLDIN B.R., "Survival of lactic acid bacteria in the human stomach and adhesion to intestinal cells", J DAIRY SCI, (1987), vol. 70, pages 1 - 12 | - DRAGO L ET AL., "Inhibition of in vitro growth of enteropathogens by novel lactobacillus strains of human intestinal origin", FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1997), vol. 153, pages 455 - 63 | - ESCHEMBACH DA, "History and review of bacterial vaginosis", AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (1993), vol. 169, pages 441 - 5 | - ESCHENBACH DA ET AL., "Prevalence of hydrogen peroxide-producing Lactobacillus species in normal women and women with bacterial vaginosis", J CLIN MICROBIOL, (1989), vol. 27, pages 251 - 6 | - FORSUM U ET AL., APMIS, (2005), vol. 113, pages 81 - 90 | - GILLILAND SE ET AL., J DAIRY SCI, (1978), vol. 61, pages 1 - 10 | - GIORGI A ET AL., "Identification of vaginal lactobacilli from asymptomatic women", MICROBIOLOGICA, (1987), vol. 10, pages 377 - 84 | - GISMONDO M.R. ET AL., "An experimental model to reproduce some bacterial intestinal cocultures in germ-free mice", DRUGS EXPTL CLIN RES XX, (1994), pages 149 - 52 | - GUMMA A.; FILTHUTH I.; MIRIMANOFF A, "Etude de quelques precedes galeniques appliques a la therapeutique de substitution par Lactobacillus acidophilus", PHARMACEUTICA ACTA HELVETIAE, (1979), vol. 47, pages 164 - 7 | - HILLIER SL ET AL., "The normal vaginal flora, H202-producing lactobacilli, and bacterial vaginosis in pregnant women", CLIN INFECT DIS, (1993), vol. 16, pages 273 - 81 | - JOHNSON M.C.; RAY B.; BHOWMIK T, "Selection of Lactobacillus acidophilus strains for use in "acidophilus products"", ANTOINE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1987), vol. 53, pages 215 - 231 | - "The microbial ecology of the gastrointestinal tract", LEE A; NEGLECTED NICHES, Advances in Microbial Ecology, PLENUM PRESS N.Y., (1985), vol. 8, pages 115 - 162 | - MARDH P; SOLTESZ LV, "In vitro interactions between Lactobacilli and other microrganisms occurring in the vaginal flora", SCAND J INFECT DIS SUPPL, (1983), vol. 40, pages 47 - 51 | - MAY AM; HAWES SE; HILLIER SL, "The identification of vaginal Lactobacillus species and the demographic and microbiologic characteristics of women colonized by these species", J INFECT DIS, (1999), vol. 180, pages 1950 - 6 | - MARELLI G; PAPALEO E; FERRARI A, "Lactobacilli for prevention of urogenital infections: a review", EUR REV MED PHARMACOL SCI, (2004), vol. 8, pages 87 - 95 | - MELIS GB ET AL., "Role of pH as a regulator of vaginal physiological environment", MERVA GYNECOL, (2000), vol. 52, pages 111 - 21 | - OZKINAY E ET AL., "The effectiveness of live lactobacilli in combination with low dose oestriol (Gynoflor) to restore the vaginal flora after treatment of vaginal infections", BJOG, (2005), vol. 112, pages 234 - 40 | - REDONDO-LOPEZ V; COOK RL; SOBEL JD, "Emerging role of lactobacilli in the control and maintenance of the vaginal bacterial microflora", REV INFECT DIS, (1990), vol. 12, pages 856 - 72 | - REID G; BOCKING A, "The potential for probiotics to prevent bacterial vaginosis and preterm labor", AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, vol. 189, pages 1202 - 8 | - REID G; BRUCE AW, "Urogenital infections in women: can probiotics help", POSTGRAD MED J, (2003), vol. 79, pages 428 - 32 | - SILVA M. ET AL., "Antimicrobial Substance from a human Lactobacillus strain", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (1987), vol. 31, pages 1231 - 1233 | - WADSTROM T ET AL., "Surface properties of lactobacilli isolated from the small intestine of pigs", J APPLIED BACTERIOL, (1987), vol. 62, pages 513 - 520 | - WOOD JR ET AL., "In vitro adherence of Lactobacillus species to vaginal epithelial cells", AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (1985), vol. 153, pages 740 - 3 |