EP2128408 - Method for calibrating an actuator system for a variable nozzle of a turbocharger and data processing apparatus for carrying out such method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/49] | Method of calibrating an actuator system for a variable nozzle of a turbocharger | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garrett Transportation I Inc. 2525 W. 190th St. Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2019/07] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Padhye, Umesh V. 4812 Reynolds Rd. Torrance, CA 90505 / US | 02 /
Ratke, Todd 3201 West Lomita Boulevard Torrance, CA 90505 / US | 03 /
Mackenzie, Scott 1420 Stonewood Ct. San Pedro, CA 90732 / US | [2021/27] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
Padhye, Umesh V. 4812 Reynolds Rd. Torrance, CA 90505 / US | ||
02 /
Ratke, Todd 3201 West Lomita Boulevard Torrance, CA 90505 / US | |||
03 /
Mackenzie, Scott 1420 Stonewood Ct. San Pedro, CA 90732 / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Peter Lawrence, et al LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2021/27] |
Former [2009/49] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09160949.5 | 22.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | US20080129343 | 29.05.2008 Original published format: US 129343 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2128408 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2128408 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128408 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/24, F02B39/16, F02D41/14, F02D41/24, F02D43/02, F02D41/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F02B37/24 (EP,US);
F02B39/16 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/1448 (EP,US);
F02D41/2432 (EP,US);
F02D41/2464 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | F02D23/02, F02D41/24, F02B37/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kalibrierung eines Betätigungssystems für eine variable Düse eines Turboladers und Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung zur Durchführung solch eines Verfahren | [2021/01] | English: | Method for calibrating an actuator system for a variable nozzle of a turbocharger and data processing apparatus for carrying out such method | [2021/01] | French: | Procédé de calibrage d'un système actionneur pour la buse variable d'un turbocompresseur et appareil de traitement de données pour la mise en oeuvre d'un tel procédé | [2021/01] |
Former [2009/49] | Verfahren zur Kalibrierung eines Betätigungssystems für eine variable Düse eines Turboladers | ||
Former [2009/49] | Method of calibrating an actuator system for a variable nozzle of a turbocharger | ||
Former [2009/49] | Procédé de calibrage d'un système actionneur pour la buse variable d'un turbocompresseur | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2009 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.05.2009 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.05.2009 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2842869 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP1703110 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]); | [I]US2008011071 (FIGURA GIORGIO [FR]); | [L]EP2067957 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) | by applicant | US2008011071 |