EP2256768 - Safety rotary operator assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ewac Holding B.V. Hekendorpstraat 69 3079 DX Rotterdam / NL | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reddering, Maarten Willem Dille 19 5063 EE, Oisterwijk / NL | 02 /
Magermans, Marcel P. Rijsbes 101 2498 AP, 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 09161033.7 | 25.05.2009 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256768 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/20, H01H71/50, G05G1/08, G05G5/00, G05G5/02, // H01H71/56 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H01H3/20 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/25 (EP,US);
G05G1/08 (EP,US);
G05G5/005 (EP,US);
H01H71/501 (EP,US);
B60K2360/126 (EP,US);
H01H2009/288 (EP,US);
H01H71/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sicherheits-Drehknopf-Anwendung | [2010/48] | English: | Safety rotary operator assembly | [2010/48] | French: | Ensemble opérateur rotatif sécurisé | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 01.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2231598 (SHROYER JACOB L) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4037490 (WILSON ARTHUR C) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4311887 (TAKAGI MASATOMO, et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10152425 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0450699 | DE4206378 | US5302925 |