EP2130660 - Device and method for producing slush skins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Automotive Components Group GmbH Krützpoort 16 47804 Krefeld / DE | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergers, Helmut Mörtelstrasse 141 47929 Grafrath / DE | 02 /
Berger, Benno Wallbergstrasse 1 85560 Ebersberg / DE | 03 /
Zipper, Wolfgang Ostermayerstrasse 34 83308 Trostberg / DE | 04 /
Steger, Ulrich Wittelsbacher Strasse 31 85586 Poing / DE | 05 /
Braun, Wilhelm Dr. Mitterwieserstrasse 9 83556 Griesstätt / DE | 06 /
Meindl, Wolfgang Paul-Keller-Weg 12 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2011/38] |
Former [2009/50] | 01 /
Bergers, Helmut Mörtelstrasse 141 47929 Grafrath / DE | ||
02 /
Berger, Benno Wallbergstrasse 1 85560 Ebersberg / DE | |||
03 /
Zipper, Wolfgang Ostermayerstrasse 34 83308 Trostberg / DE | |||
04 /
Steger, Ulrich Wittelsbacher Strasse 31 85586 Poing / DE | |||
05 /
Braun, Wilhelm Dr. Mitterwieserstrasse 9 83556 Griesstätt / DE | |||
06 /
Meindl, Wolfgang Paul-Keller-Weg 12 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09161328.1 | 28.05.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | DE20081026365 | 02.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008026365 | [2009/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130660 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2130660 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/18, B29C33/34, B29C41/46 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
B29C41/18 (EP);
B29C33/34 (EP);
B29C41/46 (EP);
B29L2031/3005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Slush-Häuten | [2009/50] | English: | Device and method for producing slush skins | [2009/50] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de fabrication de peaux d'embouage | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2009 | CY | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | HR | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | MK | 21.09.2011 | MT | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | NO | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | LU | 28.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
LU | 28.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3506755 (RUDDER WALTER H, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 4; figure 1 * * column 8, line 54 - line 58 *; | [A]US4755333 (GRAY JOHN D [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 7; figures 2,3 *; | [A]JPH06190846 (NISHIKAWA KASEI KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]WO03031139 (COLLINS & AIKMAN AUTOMOTIVE CO [US], et al) [AD] * abstract * | by applicant | US4217325 | US4389177 | US4623503 | DE4023878 | US5106285 | US6019390 | US6082989 | DE19928861 | WO03031139 | US2004065981 | WO2005016613 | EP1655121 |