EP2130613 - Motorised device for cleaning at least one crucible of a brazing installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abouassam, Aïcha / 70 boulevard Yves Guillou 14000 Caen / FR | 02 /
Faudemer, Daniel / Lot du Domaine de la Chapelle 14260 Aunay sur Audon / FR | 03 /
Leplanois, Claude / 2 Bis rue de la Grosse Tour 14840 Cuverville / FR | [2011/47] |
Former [2009/50] | 01 /
Abouassam, Aïcha 70 boulevard Yves Guillou 14000 Caen / FR | ||
02 /
Faudemer, Daniel Lot du Domaine de la Chapelle 14260 Aunay sur Audon / FR | |||
03 /
Leplanois, Claude 2 Bis rue de la Grosse Tour 14840 Cuverville / FR | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [2009/50] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 09161334.9 | 28.05.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | FR20080003289 | 02.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803289 | [2009/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130613 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2130613 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B08B1/04 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
B23K1/206 (EP);
B08B1/34 (EP);
B23K3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Motorisierte Reinigungsvorrichtung mindestens eines Tiegels einer Lötanlage | [2009/50] | English: | Motorised device for cleaning at least one crucible of a brazing installation | [2009/50] | French: | Dispositif motorisé de nettoyage d'au moins un creuset d'une installation de brasage | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2011 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | IT | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | MK | 23.11.2011 | MT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | NO | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | LU | 28.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3900911 (HAYASHI JYOJI); | [A]JPH02271590 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]DE9420710U (H2 ING GES MBH [DE]); | [A]EP0810039 (SHINKO KK [JP]); | [X]US2003217429 (LARSON ROBERT [US], et al); | [X]US2007017088 (ISHITANI YASUYUKI [JP]) |