EP2255793 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising tamsulosin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | 11.11.2011 | Change - inventor | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRKA, tovarna zdravil, d.d., Novo mesto Smarjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo mesto / SI | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Krka Tovarna Zdravil, D.D., Novo Mesto Smarjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo Mesto / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sedmak, Gregor Palmejeva 30 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
Stefanic, Marko Tomsiceva ulica 14 8340 Crnomelj / SI | [2011/50] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Sedmak, Gregor Palmejeva 30 1000 Ljubljana / SI | ||
02 /
Stefanic, Marko Tomsiceva ulica 14 8340 Crnomejl / SI | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09161448.7 | 28.05.2009 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255793 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/2031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit Tamsulosin | [2010/48] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising tamsulosin | [2010/48] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique comprenant du tamsulosine | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2042169 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS [SI]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0020] , [0025] - [0033] * * example 1 * [Y] 2-16; | [Y]EP1523994 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0012] , [0027] , [0031] , [0032] , [0077] *; | [A]EP1529526 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0661045 | EP1523994 | WO2007131804 | EP1568361 | EP1529526 | EP0034432 | AT397960B | EP0380144 | WO03035608 | WO2005063702 |