EP2257012 - Multi-carrier modulation of optical channels with reduced optical power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg-Simon-Ohm Hochschule für angewandte Wissenschaften Fachhochschule Nürnberg Wassertorstrasse 10 90489 Nürnberg / DE | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziemann, Olaf Kobergerstr. 70 90408, Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Poisel, Hans Pühlhof 14 91227, Leinburg / DE | [2013/06] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Ziemann, Olaf Kobergerstr. 70 90408, Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
Poisel, Hans Pühlhof 14 91227, Leinburg / DE | Representative(s) | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Lohr, Georg Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstrasse 3 82178 Puchheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09161505.4 | 29.05.2009 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257012 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2257012 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04B10/66 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H04L27/2614 (EP,US);
H04L27/2626 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP);
H04L27/2697 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | H04L27/26, H04B10/152 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | Mehrträgermodulation optischer Kanäle mit reduzierter optischer Leistung | [2010/48] | English: | Multi-carrier modulation of optical channels with reduced optical power | [2010/48] | French: | Modulation multi-porteuses de canaux optiques avec puissance optique réduite | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2009 | CY | 06.02.2013 | CZ | 06.02.2013 | DK | 06.02.2013 | EE | 06.02.2013 | FI | 06.02.2013 | HR | 06.02.2013 | IT | 06.02.2013 | LT | 06.02.2013 | LV | 06.02.2013 | MC | 06.02.2013 | MK | 06.02.2013 | MT | 06.02.2013 | NL | 06.02.2013 | PL | 06.02.2013 | RO | 06.02.2013 | SE | 06.02.2013 | SI | 06.02.2013 | SK | 06.02.2013 | TR | 06.02.2013 | BG | 06.05.2013 | NO | 06.05.2013 | GR | 07.05.2013 | ES | 17.05.2013 | GB | 29.05.2013 | IE | 29.05.2013 | LU | 29.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | FR | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | IS | 06.06.2013 | PT | 06.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
MK | 06.02.2013 | ||
MT | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
TR | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
GB | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
MT | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
GB | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
GB | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
FR | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
GB | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
IT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
MC | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 06.02.2013 | |
CZ | 06.02.2013 | ||
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 06.02.2013 | |
DK | 06.02.2013 | ||
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
RO | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
SK | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 06.02.2013 | |
EE | 06.02.2013 | ||
FI | 06.02.2013 | ||
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
NL | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 06.02.2013 | |
HR | 06.02.2013 | ||
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 06.02.2013 | |
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
PT | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 06.02.2013 | |
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
LV | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.02.2013 | |
LT | 06.02.2013 | ||
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
SI | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
GR | 07.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 06.02.2013 | |
PL | 06.02.2013 | ||
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
ES | 17.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.02.2013 | |
SE | 06.02.2013 | ||
BG | 06.05.2013 | ||
NO | 06.05.2013 | ||
IS | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.02.2013 | |
NO | 06.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006140296 (CLEVELAND JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] , [0045] , [0049] , [0050]; figures 2,5-9 *; | [A]EP2017981 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1,5,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0035] , [0037] , [0045] , [0046]; figure 3 *; | [A] - AMSTRONG J, "OFDM for Opticl Communications", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (20090201), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 189 - 204, XP002554187 [A] 1,5,11-13 * paragraphs V to VI * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2008.2010061 | by applicant | US6954505 | EP1469649 |