EP2130469 - Hand held blender with switch arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilson, Ian Geoffrey 40 Cochran Road Cheltenham, NSW 2119 / AU | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09162042.7 | 05.06.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | AU20080902873 | 06.06.2008 Original published format: AU 2008902873 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130469 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/044 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
A47J43/044 (EP,US);
A47J43/0755 (EP,US);
A47J43/082 (EP,US);
A47J2043/04427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Handmixgerät mit Schalteranordnung | [2009/50] | English: | Hand held blender with switch arrangement | [2009/50] | French: | Mixer à main avec agencement de commutateur | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007007448 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5368384 (DUNCAN J KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2007046111 (LAGIER CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2005078549 (HAMELIN FRANCK [FR]) [X] 1-5,15 * figure 1 * |