EP2133810 - Computer input device, method for inputting data to a computer, computing apparatus and computer software product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Human Interface Security Ltd. Afek Industrial Park 16 Hamelacha Street 48091 Rosh Haayin / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Human Interface Security Ltd. Afek Industrial Park 16 Hamelacha Street 48091 Rosh Ha'ayin / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frenkel, Lior Moshav Misgav Dov number 143 Gadera / IL | 02 /
Zilberstein, Amir Meshek 43 Yad Rambam 99793 Yad Rambam / IL | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09162276.1 | 09.06.2009 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | IL20080192043 | 10.06.2008 Original published format: IL 19204308 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2133810 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2133810 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/04 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G06F21/83 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computereingabevorrichtung, Verfahren zur Dateneingabe in einen Computer, Rechnervorrichtung und Computersoftwareprodukt | [2009/51] | English: | Computer input device, method for inputting data to a computer, computing apparatus and computer software product | [2009/51] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée informatique, procédé d'entrée de données dans un ordinateur, appareil informatique et produit de logiciel d'ordinateur | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2267986 (ALGORITHMIC RES LTD [IL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO9526085 (INNOVONICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 12-30 * * page 11, lines 11-18 *; | [I]US5822435 (BOEBERT WILLIAM E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 5, line 14 - line 51 *; | [A]WO0110079 (SAFE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]US2005066186 (GENTLE CHRISTOPHER REON [AU], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] *; | [I]US2008120511 (NAGUIB NAYER NABIL [EG]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] * |