EP2133893 - Polymer composites and methods of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tan, Daniel Qi 4 New York Court Rexford, NY 12148 / US | 02 /
Cao, Yang 1206 Carlyle Drive Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
Irwin, Patricia Chapman 1097 Knox Cave Road Altamont, NY 12009 / US | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Szary, Anne Catherine GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09162433.8 | 10.06.2009 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | US20080137564 | 12.06.2008 Original published format: US 137564 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133893 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/20, H01G7/06, // H01G4/33 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
H01G4/206 (EP,US);
H01G7/06 (EP,US);
H01L28/55 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H01G4/33 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | Polymerverbundstoffe und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2009/51] | English: | Polymer composites and methods of making the same | [2009/51] | French: | Composites de polymères et leurs procédés de fabrication | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 27.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1791195 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0015] - [0018] - [0024] - [0030] - [0039] , [0048] , [0056] , [0059] *; | [X]EP1843406 (TNO [NL]) [X] 1,2,4-13 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0023] - [0033] - [0035] - [0041] *; | [X]US2005137281 (VOSS-KEHL JESSICA L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0010] , [0017] - [0021] - [0025] , [0039] , [0053] , [0054] * | by applicant | EP1791195 | EP1843406 | US2005137281 |