EP2143464 - Implantable electrode lead or electrode lead device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dörr, Thomas Alpenrosenweg 43a 12437, Berlin / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2010/02] | 01 /
Dörr, Thomas Alpenrosenweg 43a 12437, Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus, et al Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Galander, Marcus, et al Biotronik SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09162536.8 | 12.06.2009 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | DE20081040304 | 10.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008040304 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2143464 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2143464 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2143464 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61N1/0573 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2010/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Implantierbare Elektrodenleitung oder Elektrodenleitungsanordnung | [2010/02] | English: | Implantable electrode lead or electrode lead device | [2010/02] | French: | Sonde électrode implantable ou appareil sonde électrode | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.10.2016 | 19.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16195063.9 / EP3141279 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2009 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | MT | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | AT | 12.06.2017 | GB | 12.06.2017 | LU | 12.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
AT | 12.06.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
AT | 12.06.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
AT | 12.06.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
AT | 12.06.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
GB | 12.06.2017 | ||
LU | 12.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | ES | 18.01.2017 | |
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2006105395 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,9 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 5 * * page 9, line 10 - line 24; figure - * [I] 3,5-8,10-15; | [I]EP1516644 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0027] , [0031] , [0032] , [0037] - [0039]; figure - *; | [I]US2008082132 (ANNEST LON S [US], et al) [I] 1,4-6,8-15 * paragraphs [0071] - [0073]; figure - *; | [I]WO2008058265 (EMERGE MEDSYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0093] - [0095] - [ 134] - [0136]; figures 4-5b, 13A-14B *; | [A]US5728140 (SALO RODNEY W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 19; figure - * | by applicant | WO2006105395 | - VAN GELDER BM; SCHEFFER MG; MEIJER A ET AL., HEART RHYTHM, (200704), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 454 - 60 | - MCCONNELL, PI ET AL., ASAIO JOURNAL, (200503), vol. 51, no. 2, page 31 | - ANDREA DONTI ET AL., CATHETERIZATION AND CARDIOVASCULAR INTERVENTIONS, (2006), vol. 68, no. 5 |