EP2260748 - Feeding tube for a food processor and food processor provided with a feeding tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Damen, Daniel Martijn Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09162537.6 | 12.06.2009 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2260748 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/00, B26D7/06 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
A47J43/07 (EP,US);
A47J43/00 (KR);
A23L35/20 (KR);
A47J45/00 (KR);
B26D7/0625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Füllschacht für ein Küchengerät und Küchengerät mit einem Füllschacht | [2010/50] | English: | Feeding tube for a food processor and food processor provided with a feeding tube | [2010/50] | French: | Tuyau d'alimentation pour robot-mixeur et robot-mixeur doté d'un tuyau d'alimentation | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/31] | 26.03.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102007021371 (REIFENHAEUSER UWE [DE]) [X] 1,6,10-12,14 * paragraph [0026]; figure - *; | [X]US3410517 (WALL THOMAS E) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US4978100 (PEURIFOY DAVID L [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US4624030 (DREISIN ILYA [US]) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]FR2873010 (LIN KUAN CHIH [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]FR2681279 (ROBOT COUPE SA [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE2302943 (HEINZERLING AUGUST) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2302943 | FR2681279 | WO2007080571 |