EP2261402 - Method for producing germanium semiconductor nanowires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/50] | Method and System for the Synthesis of Semiconductor Nano-wires | ||
[2013/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick / IE | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Kevin M. Cranmore Cluggin Oola Co. Limerick / IE | 02 /
Barrett, Christopher 55 Caislean na hAbhann Castletroy Limerick / IE | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Ryan, Kevin M. Cranmore Cluggin Oola Co. Limerick / IE | ||
02 /
Barrett, Christopher 55 Caislean na hAbhann Castletroy Limerick / IE | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Lucey, Michael PURDYLUCEY Intellectual Property Suite 138-139 The Chapel Building Mary's Abbey Dublin 7 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09162561.6 | 12.06.2009 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261402 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261402 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/60, C30B7/02, C30B29/08, C30B23/00 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
C30B29/60 (EP,US);
C30B23/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/08 (EP,US);
C30B7/02 (EP,US);
H01L21/02422 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02603 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
Y10S977/762 (EP,US);
Y10S977/775 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | C30B29/60, C30B29/08, C30B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Halbleiter-Nanodrähten aus Germanium | [2013/13] | English: | Method for producing germanium semiconductor nanowires | [2013/13] | French: | Procédé pour la production de nano-fils semi-conducteurs de germanium | [2013/13] |
Former [2010/50] | Verfahren und System zur Synthese von Halbleiter-Nanoleiterbahnen | ||
Former [2010/50] | Method and System for the Synthesis of Semiconductor Nano-wires | ||
Former [2010/50] | Procédé et système pour la synthèse de nano-fils à semi-conducteurs | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2009 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MK | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | LU | 12.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - FENG C ET AL, "Synthesis of short palladium nanoparticle chains and their application in catalysis", SOLID STATE SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 1293-2558, (20081001), pages 1327 - 1332, (20080111), XP025520206 [X] 14,15 *experimental section* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solidstatesciences.2008.01.004 | [A] - CHOCKLA ET AL., "Seeded germanium nanowire synthesis in solution", J.MATER.CHEM, (20090106), vol. 19, pages 996 - 1001, XP002544520 [A] 1,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b816954c | [A] - FITZPATRICK P R ET AL, "Oxidation resistance of thin boron carbo-nitride films on Ge(100) and Ge nanowires", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 517, no. 13, ISSN 0040-6090, (20090501), pages 3686 - 3694, (20090207), XP026052800 [A] 1,9 *experimental* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tsf.2009.01.158 | [AD] - ZAITSEVA ET AL, "Unseeded growth of germanium nanowires by vapour-liquid-solid mechanism", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2005), vol. 86, pages 1 - 3, XP002544515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1856695 | [AD] - KIM ET AL, "catalyst-free growth of single-crystal silicon and germanium nanowires", NANO LETTERS, (2009), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 864 - 869, XP002544516 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl803752w | [AD] - GERION ET AL., "Solution synthesis of germanium nanocrystals: success and open challenges", NANO LETTERS, (2004), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 597 - 602, XP002544517 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl035231t | [AD] - ZAITSEVA ET AL., "Germanium nanocrystals synthesized in high boiling point organic solvents", CHEM.MATER., (20070914), vol. 19, pages 5174 - 5178, XP008111576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm070062p | by applicant | - KIM, B.-S. ET AL., NANO LETT., (2009), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 864 - 869 | - GERION, D. ET AL., NANO LETT., (2004), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 597 - 602 | - GERUNG, H. ET AL., AM. GERMAN CHEM. SOC., (2006), vol. 128, no. 15, pages 5244 - 5250 | - ZAITSEVA, N. ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2007), vol. 19, no. 21, pages 5174 - 5178 | - ZAITSEVA, N. ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2005), vol. 86, no. 5, pages 1 - 3 |