EP2138407 - Container, in particular a bottle, with at least one flute with variable depth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville Sur Mer / FR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boukobza, Michel c/o SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS Avenue de la Patrouille 76930, OCTEVILLE-SUR-MER / FR | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Siloret, Patrick Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville-sur-mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09162605.1 | 12.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | FR20080053957 | 16.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0853957 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138407 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B65D79/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B65D79/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behälter, insbesondere Flasche, mit mindestens einer Nut mit variabler Tiefe | [2010/01] | English: | Container, in particular a bottle, with at least one flute with variable depth | [2010/01] | French: | Récipient, notamment bouteille, avec au moins une cannelure à profondeur variable | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH10236450 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2006261030 (MANDERFIELD GROVER J JR [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 38 - paragraph 39; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6527133 (MCCOLLUM MATTHEW STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 9; figure - *; | [A]EP0437620 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2132101 (HOOVER BALL & BEARING CO) [A] 1 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 2; figures 5,7,8 *; | [A]US2006108317 (TANAKA TOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 20 - page 2, paragraph 26; figure - *; | [A]GB2025889 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | US2006261030 |