EP2146040 - Insulating glass pane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states seele holding GmbH & Co. KG Einsteinring 1 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Seele holding GmbH & Co.KG Einsteinring 1 86368 Gersthofen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seele, Gerhard Mozartstraße 18 86356, Neusäß / DE | 02 /
Kassnel-Henneberg, Bruno Zeisigweg 6 86420, Diedorf/Anhausen / DE | 03 /
Rohrer, Emil Kochelseering 2 86343, Königsbrunn / DE | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Seele, Gerhard Mozartstraße 18 86356, Neusäß / DE | ||
02 /
Kassnel-Henneberg, Bruno Zeisigweg 6 86420, Diedorf/Anhausen / DE | |||
03 /
Rohrer, Emil Kochelseering 2 86343, Königsbrunn / DE | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Depotstrasse 5 1/2 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09162912.1 | 17.06.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | DE20081033249 | 15.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008033249 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2146040 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2146040 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146040 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/663, E06B3/677 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
E06B3/663 (EP,US);
E06B2003/66385 (EP,US);
E06B3/66328 (EP,US);
E06B3/66366 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | E06B3/663 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Isolierglasscheibe | [2010/03] | English: | Insulating glass pane | [2010/03] | French: | Vitrage isolant | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 09.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2009 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | IT | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | IE | 17.06.2013 | LU | 17.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4149348 (PYZEWSKI STANLEY J) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 58; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 7-10,15; | [Y]DE2730119 (ZIMMERMANN WALTER DIPL ING) [Y] 3-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4994309 (REICHERT GERHARD [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,13 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE1265385 (LIBBEY OWENS FORD GLASS CO) [A] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001001357 (REICHERT GERHARD [US]) [A] 7 * figure 12 *; | [A]DE202006000835U (SEELE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 8-10 * paragraph [0001] * |