EP2263533 - Enhancing security and emergency functionalities in mobile phones based on detection of physical shocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketabdar, Hamed Kaubstrasse 8 10713 Berlin / DE | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09163074.9 | 18.06.2009 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2263533 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, H04M1/725 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G08B21/043 (EP);
H04M1/72421 (EP);
A61B2562/0219 (EP);
A61B5/1117 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Verbesserung der Sicherheits- und Notfallfunktionalitäten in Mobiltelefonen auf Grundlage des Erkennens physikalischer Stösse | [2010/51] | English: | Enhancing security and emergency functionalities in mobile phones based on detection of physical shocks | [2010/51] | French: | Amélioration des fonctionnalités de sécurité et d'urgence dans des téléphones mobiles basés sur la détection de chocs physiques | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 27.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002118110 (EKKEL FREDERIK [US]) [A] 1-11,14-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [XD]JP2003219061 (NEC SAITAMA LTD) [XD] 1,12-15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] *; | [X]US2005046580 (MIRANDA-KNAPP CARLOS A [US], et al) [X] 1,9,11 * paragraph [0017] * * claim 1 *; | [XA]US2005128062 (LUNDSGAARD SOREN K [US], et al) [X] 1,14-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 2-11; | [X]US2005208925 (PANASIK CARL M [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10,14-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0043] *; | [XA]US2006161079 (CHOI JI-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-8,10,14-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0029] * * claim 17 * [A] 2,4,6,9,11; | [A]WO2006101587 (FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1,7-8,10 * paragraph [0054] *; | [XA]CH697402 (LIFEJOB AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-7,14-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * claim 1 * [A] 5; | [A] - MIHAIL POPESCU ET AL, "An acoustic fall detector system that uses sound height information to reduce the false alarm rate", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 2008. EMBS 2008. 30TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080820), ISBN 978-1-4244-1814-5, pages 4628 - 4631, XP031347778 [A] 12-13 * page 4629, column R - page 4630, column L * | [A] - MIHAIL POPESCU ET AL, "A Fuzzy Logic System for Acoustic Fall Detection", PROCEEDINGS. 2008 AAAI SYMPOSIUM ON AI IN ELDERCARE,, (20081101), pages 1 - 6, XP007908814 [A] 13 * page 3, column l * | [A] - CHARALAMPOS DOUKAS ET AL, Human Distress Sound Analysis and Characterization Using Advanced Classification Techniques, ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE: THEORIES, MODELS AND APPLICATIONS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 73 - 84, (20081002), ISBN 9783540878803, XP019107502 [A] 12-13 * page 73, paragraph 2 - page 74, paragraph 1 * * page 75 * * page 77 * | by applicant | US4823290 | EP1109378 | JP2001219061 | US6453266 | JP2003219061 | - LAWRENCE RABINER; BIING-HWANG JUANG, Fundamentals of Speech Recognition, PTR PRENTICE HALL |