EP2096406 - Rotational-rate sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozoe, Toshiyuki Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Yosiuti, Sigehiro Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Kawasaki, Shusaku Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Jitousho, Noriyuki Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Ohuchi, Satoshi Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09163252.1 | 14.10.2004 | [2009/36] | Priority number, date | JP20030357695 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003357695 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2096406 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2096406 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G01C19/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/36] | Title | German: | Drehzahlmesser | [2009/36] | English: | Rotational-rate sensor | [2009/36] | French: | Capteur de vitesse de rotation | [2009/36] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 11.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2013 | 12.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04024542.5 / EP1524499 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040024542) is 21.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0660081 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [Y]EP1091189 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | JPH07118522 | US2003010121 | by applicant | JPH11287658 | WO2004024542 |