EP2146431 - Inductive proximity sensor for embedded mounting and method of designing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optosys SA Route André Piller 50 1762 Givisiez / CH | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE HUU, Marc L'Aubépena 12 1489, Murist / CH | 02 /
HEIMLICHER, Peter Klein-Schoenberg 112 1700, Fribourg / CH | 03 /
RHÊME, Charles Impasse du Coutset 10 1725, Posieux / CH | 04 /
VENIER, Philippe Route du Vallon 9 1782, La Corbaz / CH | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 09163373.5 | 22.06.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | EP20080405180 | 15.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08405180 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2146431 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2146431 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/95 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
H03K17/9505 (EP,US);
H03K17/9502 (EP,US);
H03K17/9547 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Induktiver Näherungssensor für eingebettete Montage und Verfahren zum Entwurf desselben | [2010/08] | English: | Inductive proximity sensor for embedded mounting and method of designing the same | [2010/03] | French: | Capteur de proximité inductif pour montage noyé et son procédé pour la conception de celui-ci | [2010/08] |
Former [2010/03] | Induktiver Nähensensor zur eingebetteten Formung und Entwurfsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/03] | Capteur à proximité inductif pour assemblage intégré et son procédé de conception | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]DE3438998 (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [ID] 1-6,8,9 * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2; figure 2 *; | [I]EP1372173 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [I] 1-6,8,9,14 * paragraphs [0109] - [0138]; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]DE10341113 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0081] - [0092] - [ 101] , [ 109] - [0112]; figures 1-3,6,8,17 * [I] 2,7-13,15; | [A] - KOIBUCHI K ET AL, "CHARACTERISTIC ANALYSIS AND ENHANCEMENT OF SENSING PROPERTY FOR EDDY-CURRENT TYPE PROXIMITY SENSOR", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS, ELECTRONICS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (20050801), vol. E88-C, no. 8, ISSN 0916-8524, pages 1696 - 1703, XP001232854 [A] 14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ietele/e88-c.8.1696 | by applicant | DE3438998 |