EP2143767 - Waterbased compositions for casting or printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acreo Swedish ICT AB Electrum 236 164 40 Kista / SE | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Acreo AB Electrum 236 164 40 Kista / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sandberg, Mats Tulegatan 15 602 17, NORRKÖPING / SE | 02 /
Hellström, Stefan Doktor Saléns gata 5 413 22, GÖTEBORG / SE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Inga-Lill Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2012/33] |
Former [2010/02] | Haag, Malina Anna AWAPATENT AB Patent Department P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 09165052.3 | 09.07.2009 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | US20080129692P | 11.07.2008 Original published format: US 129692 P | EP20080160170 | 11.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08160170 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143767 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C08G61/12, H01L51/00 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
C08L79/02 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP,US);
C09D11/52 (EP,US);
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
H01B1/128 (EP,US);
H01B1/20 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1424 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3223 (EP,US);
C08G2261/51 (EP,US);
C08G2261/794 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L65/00, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L79/02, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen auf Wasserbasis zum Giessen oder Drucken | [2010/02] | English: | Waterbased compositions for casting or printing | [2010/02] | French: | Compositions à base d'eau pour moulage ou impression | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002016440 (LOUWET FRANK [BE], et al); | [X]WO03000765 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]); | [X]US2003062510 (VAN DEN BOGAERT ROGER [BE]); | [X]US2003144465 (LEENDERS LUC [BE], et al); | [X]US2003215571 (TAHON JEAN-PIERRE [BE], et al); | [X]WO2006123167 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO2007007117 (CDT OXFORD LTD [GB], et al); | [X]GB2433646 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) | by applicant | WO02071505 | WO2008062149 |