EP2246953 - Rotation-type single-pull retraction mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunitec Enterprise Co. Ltd. 2F-1, 81, Chenggong Rd. Jhonghe City 235 / TW | [2011/04] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Sunitec Enterprise Co. Ltd. 2F-1, 81, Chenggong Rd. Jhanghe City 235 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chien, Chin-Wei 10F.-1, No. 200, Jingping Rd., Taipei County 235 Jhonghe City / TW | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09165160.4 | 10.07.2009 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | US20090430887 | 27.04.2009 Original published format: US 430887 | JP20090002714U | 27.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009002714 U | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2246953 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/02 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
H02G11/02 (EP);
B65H75/4431 (EP);
B65H2701/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dreh-Rückzugmechanismus mit Einmalauszug | [2010/44] | English: | Rotation-type single-pull retraction mechanism | [2010/44] | French: | Mécanisme de rétraction à simple traction de type rotatif | [2010/44] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/45] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP3151862U (SUNITEC CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * |