EP2149713 - Axial flow fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-743 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jin Baek No. 8-1406, Imgwang Apt., Maetan-3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Yi Seok No. 101-301, Everville, 504-8, Maetan-3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Cho, Min Gi No. 105, 1234-2, Maetan-3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Mo, Jin Yong No. 306-1002, Choweon-daeweon Apt., Pyeongchon-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/52] |
Former [2010/05] | 01 /
Kim, Jin Baek No. 8-1406, Imgwang Apt., Maetan-3-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
JEeong, Yi Seok No. 101-301, Everville, 504-8, Maetan-3-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Cho, Min Gi No. 105, 1234-2, Maetan-3-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Mo, Jin Yong No. 306-1002, Choweon-daeweon Apt., Pyeongchon-dong, Dongan-gu, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/52] |
Former [2010/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09165472.3 | 15.07.2009 | [2010/05] | Priority number, date | KR20080075086 | 31.07.2008 Original published format: KR 20080075086 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2149713 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2149713 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149713 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/34, F04D29/32 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
F04D29/329 (EP,US);
F04D29/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/05] | F04D29/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2010/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Axialstromventilator | [2010/05] | English: | Axial flow fan | [2010/05] | French: | Ventilateur à flux axial | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 05.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2009 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | IE | 15.07.2018 | LU | 15.07.2018 | MT | 15.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/29] | HU | 15.07.2009 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
MT | 15.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.07.2009 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
MT | 15.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
MT | 15.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
MT | 15.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19903647 (STADTMUELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 26 ** figure 2 *; | [XI]EP1895165 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-7,11,12,16 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0087] * * figures 2-5,9-12 * [I] 8-10,13-15 |