EP2147612 - Method to make a work top and top thus made [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gortan SRL Via Martignacco, 180 33100 Udine / IT | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gortan, Luca / Via Cotonificio, 225/A 33100 Udine / IT | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
Gortan, Luca Via Cotonificio, 225/A 33100 Udine / IT | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 09165627.2 | 16.07.2009 | [2010/04] | Priority number, date | IT2008UD00169 | 21.07.2008 Original published format: IT UD20080169 | [2010/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147612 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147612 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47B77/02 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
A47B77/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Arbeitsfläche und damit hergestellte Arbeitsfläche | [2010/04] | English: | Method to make a work top and top thus made | [2010/04] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de plan de travail et plan ainsi fabriqué | [2010/04] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2009 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MK | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | SM | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | NO | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | IE | 16.07.2012 | LU | 16.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MK | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
SM | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MK | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MK | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3456409 (PIGET MAURICE) [A] 1-8* figure - *; | [X]US5253932 (NESOVIC DANILO N [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 60 * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [X]DE9316147U (REITZ MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1 * page 7 - page 10 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE20201297U (POELLET WILFRIED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |