EP2157354 - An illumination apparatus for conducting and dissipating heat from a light source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lighting Science Group Corporation 1227 S Patrick Drive, Building 2A Satellite Beach, FL 32937 / US | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maxik, Frederic S. 462 Sanderling Drive Indiatlantic, FL 32903 / US | 02 /
Widjaja, Addy S. 1363 Prospect Circle N.E. Palm Bay, FL 32907 / US | 03 /
Sun, Wei 2202 Nova Village Dr. Davie, FL 33317 / US | 04 /
Henderson, David 410 N. Granger Granville, OH 43023 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09165821.1 | 17.07.2009 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | US20080183501 | 31.07.2008 Original published format: US 183501 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157354 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21Y101/02 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
F21V29/78 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | F21K99/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung zur Leitung und Ableitung von Wärme aus einer Lichtquelle | [2010/08] | English: | An illumination apparatus for conducting and dissipating heat from a light source | [2010/08] | French: | Appareil d'éclairage pour la conduction et la dissipation de chaleur à partir d'une source lumineuse | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 29.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2012 | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007159828 (WANG ROBERT [TW]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0011]; figure 2 * [Y] 8-10 [I] 2,6-7; | [Y]US2008055909 (LI JIA-HAO [TW]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; figure 3 *; | [XI]US2008062703 (CAO DENSEN [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0021] *[I] 2,4-7 | Examination | US2006232974 | by applicant | US2006050514 | US2006061997 | US7226189 |