EP2106890 - Portable Power Planer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wixey, Barry 5306 Umbrella Pool Road Sanibal, FL 33957 / US | 02 /
Welsh, Robert P 15 Glen Lyon Court Phoenix, MD 21131 / US | 03 /
Wikle, David L 25 Loucks Street York, PA 17403-99613 / US | 04 /
Doss, David J. 921 Anne Road Glen Burnie, MD 21060 / US | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09165831.0 | 18.04.2002 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | US20010284486P | 18.04.2001 Original published format: US 284486 P | US20020124746 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: US 124746 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2106890 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2106890 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B27C1/04, B27C1/14, B23Q11/00, B27G13/04, B23Q17/22, B23Q16/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
B27C1/12 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0046 (EP,US);
B23Q17/22 (EP,US);
B27C1/04 (EP,US);
B27C1/14 (EP,US);
B27G13/04 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7071 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304088 (EP,US);
Y10T409/308176 (EP,US);
Y10T409/308624 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | B27C1/04, B27C1/14, B23Q11/00, B27G13/04, B23Q17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftbetriebener Handhobel | [2009/41] | English: | Portable Power Planer | [2009/41] | French: | Rabot électrique portatif | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 15.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02252762.6 / EP1252993 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020252762) is 06.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1447878 (GEORGE LITTLEFORD, et al) [A] 12 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR990039 (MACH A TRAVAILLER LE BOIS SA D) [A] 12* figure - *; | [Y]US2642902 (LEE CAREY ERIC) [Y] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]CA497310 (CAREY ERIC L) [A] 12,13 * figure - *; | [A]US4031932 (LEASURE EDGAR F) [A] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2043822 (THOMAS J F) [Y] 3-5 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 49 - line 71 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4436462 (MARTINEZ RAFAEL [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4456042 (CLARK DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 12 * figure 7 *; | [A]US4763706 (RICE VERLE L [US], et al) [A] 12,13 * figures 1,7,8 *; | [X]US6089287 (WELSH ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10,11 * column 13, line 26 - column 14, line 12 * * figures 3,25 *; | [XYI]US6123125 (LIAO JUEI-SENG [TW]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 45 * * figures 3,4,5 * [Y] 3-5,12,13 [I] 2,6,7,9 | by applicant | US20010284486 |