EP2284154 - Antitumor 1,2-diphenylpyrrole compounds and their preparation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Argon Pharma S.L. C. Baldiri i Reixac 4-6 torre D 2n 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Argon Pharma S.L. C. Badiri i Reixac 4-6 torre D 2n 08028 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mangues Bafalluy, Ramón C. Marina, 29, 3º 1ª 08005, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Casanova Rigalt, Isolda C. Independencia, 384, 4º 3ª 08041, Barcelona / ES | 03 /
Albericio Palomera, Fernando C. Baldiri Reixac, 10-12 08028, Barcelona / ES | 04 /
Álvarez, Mercedes La Marinada, 28, torre A, 1º 3ª 08970, Sant Joan Despí (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
Savina, Sveltana C. Entença, 12 1º 4ª 08014, Barcelona / ES | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 09166668.5 | 29.07.2009 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284154 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/33, A61K31/402, A61P35/00 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
C07D207/333 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D207/335 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antitumorigene 1,2-Diphenylpyrrolverbindungen und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [2011/07] | English: | Antitumor 1,2-diphenylpyrrole compounds and their preparation process | [2011/07] | French: | Composés anti-tumoraux à base de 1,2-diphénylpyrrole et leur procédé de préparation | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0927555 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [XD] 1-9,13-15 * claim 1 * * page 3, paragraph 17 * * page 24, paragraph 64 * * page 18, compound 2-72 * * page 20, compound 2-139 *; | [YA]US5908858 (KIMURA TOMIO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-12 * claim 1 * * column 135; example 121; table 13 * * columns 31-42 * [A] 1-9,13-15; | [Y] - VACHAL PETR ET AL, "General facile synthesis of 2,5-diarylheteropentalenes", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (20040913), vol. 45, no. 38, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7157 - 7161, XP002550237 [Y] 10-12 * page 7159; table 3; compounds 12,13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2004.07.132 | by applicant | EP0927555 | - S. C. WELCH; J. M. GRUBER, J. ORQ. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, page 385 |