EP2151755 - Electronic device and method for updating bios thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pegatron Corporation 5F., 76 Ligong St. Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Pegatron Corporation 5F., 76 Ligong St. Beitou District Taipei City 112, Taiwan / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Hsien-Chung 5F., No. 76, Ligong St., Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | 02 /
Huang, Wen-Lin 5F., No. 76, Ligong St., Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09166697.4 | 29.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | TW20080128812 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: TW 97128812 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151755 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F21/00 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G06F21/572 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Aktualisierung des Bios dafür | [2010/06] | English: | Electronic device and method for updating bios thereof | [2010/06] | French: | Dispositif électronique et procédé d'actualisation des BIOS correspondants | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1357454 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0028] *; | [X]EP1072975 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]US2001056518 (MAEDA MAYUMI [JP]) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0067] *; | [X]US6591362 (LI YUNG FU [TW]) [X] 1-22 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 39 * | by applicant | EP1357454 | EP1072975 |