EP2151310 - Device for expanding containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinzinger, Rupert Sonnenweg 20 94356, Kirchroth / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Meinzinger, Rupert Sonnenweg 20 94356, Kirchroth / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/06] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09166923.4 | 31.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | DE20081036103 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036103 | [2010/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151310 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2151310 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151310 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/58, // B29C49/06 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
B29C49/58 (EP);
B29C2049/4294 (EP);
B29C2049/5827 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Expandieren von Behältnissen | [2010/06] | English: | Device for expanding containers | [2010/06] | French: | Dispositif d'agrandissement de récipients | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2009 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | AT | 31.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | GB | 31.07.2018 | IE | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | LU | 31.07.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 31.07.2009 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 31.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
GB | 31.07.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 31.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
GB | 31.07.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
AT | 31.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
GB | 31.07.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
GB | 31.07.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
GB | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
GB | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4552527 (HUNTER BURNIS L [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12-15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5454707 (MITCHELL PAUL W [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12-15 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US5711913 (SEKI NOBUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,12-15* figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2004121038 (SEKI NOBUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] , [0081] - [0083] - [0085] - [0089] - [0097] - [0099]; figures 1,3,4,7 * [I] 6 | by applicant | WO2006027092 | EP1453653 |