EP2280088 - Device for tipping a metallurgical melt container, metallurgical melt assembly and method using such a melting assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Hansjörg Friedhofstrasse 103 77694 Kehl / DE | 02 /
Poulain, Mike Griesheimer Strasse 61 77652 Offenburg / DE | 03 /
Schmid, Michael Wasserstrasse 14 77654 Offenburg / DE | 04 /
Stahlberger, Matthias Bert-Brecht-Strasse 3 77855 Achern / DE | [2011/05] | Application number, filing date | 09166992.9 | 31.07.2009 | [2011/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280088 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, F27B3/06, F27B14/02, F27B3/19, // F27D3/15 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
C21C5/50 (EP);
C21C5/5211 (EP);
F27B3/065 (EP);
F27D3/1509 (EP);
F27D3/1518 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Kippen eines metallurgischen Schmelzgefässes, metallurgische Schmelzanordnung und Verfahren unter Verwendung einer solchen Schmelzanordnung | [2011/05] | English: | Device for tipping a metallurgical melt container, metallurgical melt assembly and method using such a melting assembly | [2011/05] | French: | Dispositif de déversement d'un récipient de fusion métallurgique, agencement de fusion métallurgique et procédé sous utilisation d'un tel agencement de fusion | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0837145 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) [X] 1,13-14 * column 4, line 8 - line 16; claims 1-14 * * column 4, line 27 - line 33; figures 2a,2b,3,4 * [I] 4-12; | [YD]DE19545831 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [YD] 2-3,15-20 * column 2, line 29 - line 35 * * column 3, line 8 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]DE10227239 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [YD] 2-3,15-20 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE29580394U | DE10227239 | DE19545831 |