EP2113923 - Memory module with reduced access granularity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 4453 N First Street, Suite 100 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2020/33] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampel, Craig E. c/o Rambus, Inc. Attn. Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Cam LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Ware, Frederick A. c/o Rambus, Inc. Attn. Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Cam LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | [2020/31] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Hampel, Craig E. c/o Rambus, Inc. Attn. Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Cam LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Ware, Frederick A. c/o Rambus, Inc. Attn. Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Cam LOS ALTOS, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2020/31] |
Former [2009/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167223.8 | 30.04.2007 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | US20060381349 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: US 381349 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113923 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113923 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/10, G06F13/16, G06F13/42, H05K1/18, G11C5/04 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
G06F13/1642 (EP,US);
G06F12/1081 (US);
G06F13/1663 (EP,US);
G06F13/1678 (EP,US);
G06F13/1684 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP,US);
G06F13/4243 (EP,US);
G11C5/04 (EP,US);
G11C7/1012 (EP,US);
G11C7/1045 (EP,US);
G11C7/1075 (EP,US);
H05K1/181 (EP,US);
G06F2212/656 (US);
H05K2201/09227 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10159 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | G11C7/10, G06F13/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2020/31] |
Former [2010/08] | |||
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speichermodul mit verminderter Zugriffsgranularität | [2009/45] | English: | Memory module with reduced access granularity | [2009/45] | French: | Module de mémoire avec granularite d'accès réduite | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 24.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.11.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 20.12.2012 | Appeal received No. T0961/13 | 22.03.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.2019 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/27] | 14.08.2019 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/33] | 11.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 19.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07782931.5 / EP2016497 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070782931) is 05.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.07.2020 | [2021/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5892981 (WIGGERS HANS A [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 62 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 56 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 56; figure 3 *; | [A]US2003197201 (YANAGAWA MIKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] ** paragraphs [0056] - [0067]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2004037133 (PARK MYUN-JOO [KR], et al) [Y] 2,4 * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 33; figures 2A-4B *; | [XY]US6725316 (GANS DEAN D [US]) [X] 1,3,5,14,15 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 66 - column 7, line 54; figures 2-5 * [Y] 2,4; | [A]US2005182885 (MATSUI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0018]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | EP0910091 | US2004105292 | US2004221186 | US2004225853 | US2004256638 | by applicant | US4998262 | US5892981 | US2003197201 | US2004037133 | US6725316 | US2005182885 |