EP2154696 - Bobbin for coil, coil winding, and coil component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaneko, Kouji c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
Kaneko, Kouji TDK Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167426.7 | 07.08.2009 | [2010/07] | Priority number, date | JP20080208097 | 12.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008208097 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2154696 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2154696 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154696 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/30, H01F27/32 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
H01F27/325 (EP,US);
H01F27/306 (EP,US);
H01F27/2847 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | Spulenkörper, Spulenwicklung und Spulenbauelement | [2010/07] | English: | Bobbin for coil, coil winding, and coil component | [2010/07] | French: | Corps pour bobine, enroulement de bobine et composant de bobine | [2012/31] |
Former [2010/07] | Aggloméré pour Bobine, enroulement de bobine et composant de bobine | Examination procedure | 07.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 15.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2009 | AT | 30.01.2013 | BE | 30.01.2013 | CY | 30.01.2013 | CZ | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | EE | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | HR | 30.01.2013 | IT | 30.01.2013 | LT | 30.01.2013 | LV | 30.01.2013 | MC | 30.01.2013 | MK | 30.01.2013 | MT | 30.01.2013 | NL | 30.01.2013 | PL | 30.01.2013 | RO | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | SI | 30.01.2013 | SK | 30.01.2013 | SM | 30.01.2013 | TR | 30.01.2013 | BG | 30.04.2013 | NO | 30.04.2013 | GR | 01.05.2013 | ES | 11.05.2013 | IS | 30.05.2013 | PT | 30.05.2013 | IE | 07.08.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
MK | 30.01.2013 | ||
MT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
SM | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
IT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
RO | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
SK | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
EE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
HR | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
LV | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SI | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
PL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
ES | 11.05.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 30.01.2013 | |
LT | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
BG | 30.04.2013 | ||
NO | 30.04.2013 | ||
IS | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 30.01.2013 | |
NO | 30.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06151207 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [A]EP0820072 (MAGNETEK SPA [IT]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2003272934 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2005217311 |