EP2112643 - Ground operations and imminent landing runway selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. PO Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conner, Kevin, J. 726 Alvord Avenue N. Kent, WA 98031 / US | 02 /
Poe, John, J. 14814 219th Avenue, N.E. Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 03 /
Khatwa, Ratan 1205 225th Place SE Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | 04 /
Ishihara, Yasuo 12909 NE 136th Place Kirkland, WA 98075 / US | 05 /
Gremmert, Scott, R. 15728 NE 105th Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/38] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Conner, Kevin, J. 726 Alvord Avenue N. Kent, WA 98031 / US | ||
02 /
Poe, John, J. 14814 219th Avenue, N.E. Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | |||
03 /
Khatwa, Ratan 1205 225th Place SE Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | |||
04 /
Ishihara, Yasuo 12909 NE 136th Place Kirkland, WA 98075 / US | |||
05 /
Gremmert, Scott, R. 15728 NE 105th Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2015/38] |
Former [2010/48] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhourse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09167559.5 | 15.05.2003 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | US20020381029 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: US 381029 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112643 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2112643 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/02, G08G5/00, G08G5/06 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
G08G5/0008 (EP);
G08G5/0043 (EP);
G08G5/0078 (EP);
G08G5/0082 (EP);
G08G5/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/44] | G08G5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/38] |
Former [2009/44] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Bodenoperationen und sofortige Wahl einer Landebahn | [2009/44] | English: | Ground operations and imminent landing runway selection | [2009/44] | French: | Opérations au sol et sélection imminente d'une piste d' attérisage | [2015/19] |
Former [2009/44] | Opérations au sol et sélection imminente d'une piste d'atterrisage | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 02.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03753093.8 / EP1508131 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030753093) is 12.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0038131 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 7, lines 7-10 * * page 8, lines 26,27 * * page 12, lines 6-16 * * page 13, lines 13-31 * * page 15, lines 12-22 * * page 19, lines 11-14 *; | [A]WO9705450 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 20-50 * * column 6, lines 5-31 * | Examination | WO02071367 | by applicant | US6216064 | US6304800 | US5839080 |