EP2169745 - Cathode material for Li ion secondary battery and Li ion secondary battery using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI VEHICLE ENERGY, LTD. 1410 Inada Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-0061 / JP | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konishi, Hiroaki Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Yuasa, Toyotaka Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Mitsuru Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2012/38] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Konishi, Hiroaki Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Yuasa, Toyotaka Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Kobayashi, Mitsuru Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Erny, Tobias MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Erny, Tobias MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Erny, Tobias MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167714.6 | 12.08.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | JP20080252156 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008252156 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169745 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169745 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M4/505, H01M4/525 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
H01M10/36 (KR);
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | H01M4/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Kathodenmaterial für eine Li-Ionen-Sekundärbatterie und eine Li-Ionen-Sekundärbatterie, die dieses Material einsetzt | [2010/13] | English: | Cathode material for Li ion secondary battery and Li ion secondary battery using the same | [2010/13] | French: | Matériau de cathode pour batterie secondaire au lithium-ion, et batterie secondaire au lithium-ion l'utilisant | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 20.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2009 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | IT | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1453126 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 5-7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0033] , [0036] , [0040] , [0042] , [0061] , [0063] , [0078]; figure 1; table 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0007] - [0017] , [0019] , [0021] , [0022] , [0033] , [0036] , [0040] , [0042] , [0062] - [0064] - [0078]; figure 1; table 1 * [Y] 1-4,8,9; | [Y]US2005106463 (KIKUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0042] * | by applicant | EP1453126 | US2005106463 |