EP2163294 - System and method for recovery of co2 by aqueous carbonate flue gas capture and high efficiency bipolar membrane electrodialysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Littau, Karl A. / 3278 Bryant Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Torres, Francisco E. / 5857 Meander Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
Littau, Karl A. 3278 Bryant Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | ||
02 /
Torres, Francisco E. 5857 Meander Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09168023.1 | 18.08.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | US20080206424 | 08.09.2008 Original published format: US 206424 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2163294 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2163294 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/44, B01D53/14, B01D53/62, B01D53/78, C02F1/469 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
B01D61/445 (EP,US);
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
B01D53/96 (EP,US);
C02F1/4693 (EP,US);
B01D2251/306 (EP,US);
B01D2251/606 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Wiederherstellung von CO2 durch die Aufnahme von wässrigem Carbonatrauchgas und hochwirksame bipolare Membranelektrodialyse | [2010/11] | English: | System and method for recovery of co2 by aqueous carbonate flue gas capture and high efficiency bipolar membrane electrodialysis | [2010/11] | French: | Système et procédé de récupération de CO2 par la capture de gaz de combustion à carbonate aqueux et électrodialyse de membrane bipolaire à haut rendement | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2009 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MK | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | SM | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | IE | 18.08.2013 | LU | 18.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MK | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006036396 (GLOBAL RES TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 21, line 22 - line 30; figures 7-9,11; claim 20 *; | [X]DE4235125 (ZSW [DE]) [X] 9 * column 4, line 23 - line 54; figure 1; claim 21 *; | [A]US5281317 (MANI KRISHNAMURTHY N [US], et al) [A] 9-10 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0286143 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 9-10 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US4592817 | US4584077 | US4636289 | - TSENG, P. C.; HO, W. S.; SAVAGE, D. W., AICHE JOURNAL, (1988), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 922 - 931 | - LEE, Y. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 194, pages 57 - 67 | - HUANG, C. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 288, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 12 | - RAMIREZ, P ET AL., J ELECTROANAL CHEM, (1996), vol. 404, page 187 | - ALCARAZ, A. ET AL., POLYMER, (2000), vol. 41, pages 6627 - 663 |