EP2157520 - Information categorisation systems, modules, and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Realwire Limited Unit 1 Exchange Close Hykeham Lincoln LN6 3TR / GB | [2019/40] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Lissted Limited Wilkin Chapman LLP The Maltings 11-15 Brayford Wharf East Lincoln LN5 7AY / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Realwire Limited Quorum 16 Balliol Business Park East Benton Lane Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE12 8BX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Adam c/o Realwire Limited Quorum 16, Balliol Business Park Eas Benton Lane, Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear, NE12 8BX / GB | 02 /
Stead, Matthew 56 Epson Road Woodfields Glade Lincolnshire, LN6 0FJ / GB | 03 /
Dolby, Jonathan 10 Wasdale Close Lincoln Lincolnshire, LN6 0XR / GB | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Sessford, Russell, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Sessford, Russell, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09168495.1 | 24.08.2009 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | GB20080015279 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: GB 0815279 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157520 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP);
G06F16/95 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationskategorisierungssysteme, -module und -verfahren | [2010/08] | English: | Information categorisation systems, modules, and methods | [2010/08] | French: | Systèmes, modules et procédés de catégorisation d'informations | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2018 | 18.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2020 | 16.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/45] | 25.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2020 | 28.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2015 | 31.08.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2017 | 31.08.2018 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008199042 (SMITH LINDA M [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-24 *; | [A]US2003033301 (CHENG TONY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MAX CHEVALIER ET AL, "Personalized Information Access Through Flexible and Interoperable Profiles", WEB INFORMATION SYSTEMS ENGINEERING Â WISE 2007 WORKSHOPS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, (20071203), vol. 4832, ISBN 978-3-540-77009-1, pages 374 - 385, XP019084177 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2008199042 |