EP2160025 - Information processing apparatus and operation setting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawabe, Shingo c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sagane, Tomonari c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Desormiere, Pierre-Louis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09168582.6 | 25.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | JP20080217165 | 26.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008217165 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2160025 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2160025 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
H04N21/42202 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Funktionseinstellung | [2010/09] | English: | Information processing apparatus and operation setting method | [2010/09] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'informations et méthode de paramétrage de fonctionnement | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 20.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03015408 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - line 31 * * page 3, line 10 - line 15 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 10 * * page 6, line 4 - line 10 * * page 6, line 31 - line 33 * * page 9, line 1 - line 4 * * page 9, line 27 - line 34 * * page 13, line 7 - line 12 * * page 13, line 19 - line 21 *; | [A]EP1954052 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 10 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0092] *; | [A]WO0056066 (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * * abstract * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 31 *; | [A]EP1959679 (VESTEL ELEKTRONIK AS [TR]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 and 2 * * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0025] * |