EP2163907 - Cantilever with paddle for operation in dual-frequency mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states University Of Maryland 3181 Martin Hall College Park, MD 20742 / US | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölscher, Hendrik Kirchbergstr. 14 76356, Weingarten / DE | 02 /
Solares, Santiago De Jesus 12017 Tulip Grove Drive Bowie, MD Maryland 20715 / US | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Fitzner, Uwe Dres. Fitzner & Münch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09169270.7 | 02.09.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | US20080096943P | 15.09.2008 Original published format: US 96943 P | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163907 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2163907 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/38, G01Q60/32, G01Q70/10, G01Q20/04 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
G01Q60/32 (EP);
G01Q20/04 (EP);
G01Q60/38 (EP);
G01Q70/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | G01Q60/38, G01Q60/32, G01Q70/10 | ||
Former IPC [2010/11] | G01Q60/38, G01Q60/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ausleger mit Paddel zum Betrieb im Doppelfrequenzmodus | [2010/11] | English: | Cantilever with paddle for operation in dual-frequency mode | [2010/11] | French: | Cantilever avec palette de fonctionnement en mode double fréquence | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2007024711 (BEYDER ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * figures 3,4,7 * * page 16, line 1 - page 19, line 28 * [A] 5 [I] 2,6-8; | [XDA]WO2006014542 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,9,10 * paragraph [0036]; figure 5 * [A] 2,5-8 | [XI] - LEE D W ET AL, "Cantilever with integrated resonator for application of scanning probe microscope", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00378-7, (20000501), vol. 83, no. 1-3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 11 - 16, XP004198286 [X] 1-4,6,10 * figures 1-5,7-11 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * table 1 * [I] 5,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00378-7 | by applicant | WO2006014542 | WO2007024711 | - H61SCHER ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (2000), vol. 61, page 12678 | - STARK ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, page 8473 | - LEGLEITER ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, page 4813 | - SAHIN ET AL., NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 2, page 507 | - EVOY ET AL., J. APPL. PHYS., (1999), vol. 86, page 6072 | - BOONLIANG ET AL., J. MICROMECH. MICROENG, (2008), vol. 18, page 015021 | - D.W. LEE ET AL., "Cantilever with integrated resonator for application of scanning probe microscope", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, (2000), vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00378-7, pages 11 - 16, XP004198286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00378-7 | - SOLARES; CHAWLA, MEAS. SCI. TECHNOL., (2008), vol. 19, page 055502 | - H61SCHER ET AL., APPL. SURF. SCI., (1999), vol. 140, page 344 | - HOISCHER ET AL., PHYS. REV. B, (2000), vol. 61, page 12678 |