EP2145540 - Isothiazol carboxylic acid amides and their use in the protection of plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aßmann, Lutz, Dr. Postgartenstr. 10 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Kuhnt, Dietmar, Dr. Eschenallee 6d 51399 Burscheid / DE | 03 /
Elbe, Hans-Ludwig, Dr. Dasnöckel 59 42329 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Erdelen, Christoph, Dr. Unterbüscherhof 15 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 05 /
Dutzmann, Stefan, Dr. Weißenstein 95 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 06 /
Hänßler, Gerd, Dr. Am Arenzberg 58a 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
Stenzel, Klaus, Dr. Seesener Str. 17 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 08 /
Mauler-Machnik, Astrid, Dr. Neuenkamper Weg 48 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 09 /
Kitagawa, Yoshinori, Dr. 1085 Ara-Machi Moka-shi Tichigi-Ken 321-4305 / JP | 10 /
Kawada, Haruko 848-4 Obadayashi 307-0007 Yuki-ski, Ibaraki / JP | 11 /
Sakuma, Haruhiko 4-29-19 Higashijonan-Oyama-shi 323-0829 Tochigi / JP | [2010/03] | Application number, filing date | 09169505.6 | 05.11.1998 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | DE1997150012 | 05.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19750012 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145540 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, C09C3/04, C07D275/02 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
C07D275/03 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/72 (KR);
A01N43/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2010/03] | Title | German: | Isothiazolcarbonsäureamide und deren Verwendung zum Schutz von Pflanzen | [2010/03] | English: | Isothiazol carboxylic acid amides and their use in the protection of plants | [2010/03] | French: | Amides d'acide carboxylique d'isothiazol et leur utilisation pour la protection des plantes | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02017799.4 / EP1260140 | EP98958904.9 / EP1049683 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980958904) is 16.07.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5240951 (SHIMOTORI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-8 * column 2, lines 4-34; table 1 * * column 7, lines 35-44 *; | [A]DE1770976 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-8 * page 7, lines 4,5; claim 1 *; | [A]US3341547 (MAILEY EVERETT A) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5240951 | JPH069313 |