EP2293032 - An Integrated Cytometric Sensor System and Method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radisens Diagnostic Limited The Rubicon Centre, CIT Campus Bishopstown Cork City / IE | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Brien, Jeremiah Number 7, The Avenue, Garranedarra, Wilton Cork City / IE | 02 /
Barry, Lee Lig do Scigh, Lissagroom, Crossbarry, Innishannon Co. Cork / IE | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Lucey, Michael PURDYLUCEY Intellectual Property Suite 138-139 The Chapel Building Mary's Abbey Dublin 7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Lucey, Michael PurdyLucey Intellectual Property The Capel Building, Suite 138-139 Mary's Abbey Dublin 7 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09169552.8 | 04.09.2009 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293032 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28, G01J3/51, G01N15/14 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
G01N15/1434 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
G01J3/36 (EP,US);
G01N15/1436 (EP,US);
G01N15/1459 (EP);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
G02B5/288 (EP,US);
G01J2003/1213 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Integriertes zytometrisches Sensorsystem und Verfahren | [2011/10] | English: | An Integrated Cytometric Sensor System and Method | [2011/10] | French: | Système et procédé de capteur cytométrique intégré | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007145236 (KIESEL PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0041] , [0049]; figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] , [0084] , [0089] - [0092] - [0113] , [0126] , [0131] , [0134] , [0151] , [0155] *; | [X]US2002154315 (MYRICK MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0076] , [0085] , [0089] - [0090] - [0189] - [0195] *; | [X]US2007084990 (COATES JOHN [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0039] - [0041] - [0050] *; | [A]DE102007024074 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] , [0019] , [0057] *; | [A]US2003103150 (CATRYSSE PETER B [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0042] - [0055] - [0063] - [0065] * | by applicant | WO2006104699 | WO0129538 | US2007117158 | EP0737855 | US2003142291 | WO2007103969 | US2007127863 | US5380663 | WO0194938 | US2007097364 | US2007207536 | US2006250604 | JPS5844406B | US5341238 | US2003103150 | - EBBESEN ET AL., "Extraordinary optical transmission through sub-wavelength hole arrays", NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 667 - 669 |