EP2164173 - Optical sensor and sensing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Research & Development) Limited Parkway Globe Park Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Research & Development) Limited Parkway, Globe Park Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raynor, Jeffrey M. Ambridge Hall 17 West Catherine Place Edinburgh, Lothian EH12 5HZ / GB | 02 /
Baxter, David Patrick / 28/5 Cathcart Place Edinburgh, Lothian EH11 2HE / GB | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
Raynor, Jeffrey M. Ambridge Hall 17 West Catherine Place Edinburgh, Lothian EH12 5HZ / GB | ||
02 /
Baxter, David Patrick 28/5 Cathcart Place Edinburgh, Lothian EH11 2HE / GB | Representative(s) | Hayden, Nicholas Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Hayden, Nicholas Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/11] | Hayden, Nicholas Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09169948.8 | 10.09.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | GB20080016592 | 11.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0816592 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164173 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164173 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/08 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
H03F3/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | Optischer Sensor und Messverfahren | [2010/11] | English: | Optical sensor and sensing method | [2010/11] | French: | Capteur optique et procédé de détection | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 29.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2009 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | HR | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | NO | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
HR | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
NO | 05.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5705807 (THRONGNUMCHAI KRAISORN [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10-18 * column 3, line 1 - line 25; figures 9-12 * * column 14, line 46 - column 15, line 37 * * column 16, line 19 - line 66 *; | [X]US2004080623 (CLEVELAND DIXON [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028]; figures 18-20,22 * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0118] *; | [A]EP0933870 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 6-9 * paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0933871 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 6-9 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]US4851689 (HASEGAWA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1-5,10-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9944359 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |