EP2165882 - Method for adjusting the lighting of an automobile's headlights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION Propriété Industrielle 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charpentier, Adrien 6B Sopienstrasse 70180, STUTTGART / DE | [2018/13] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
Charpentier, Adrien 6B Sopienstrasse 70180, STUTTGART / DE | Representative(s) | Claassen, Maarten Pieter, et al Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH CDA-IP Laiernstraße 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Claassen, Maarten Pieter, et al Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstraße 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170511.1 | 17.09.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | FR20080005237 | 23.09.2008 Original published format: FR 0805237 | [2010/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165882 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165882 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/14, // G06K9/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B60Q1/143 (EP);
G06V20/584 (EP);
B60Q2300/112 (EP);
B60Q2300/122 (EP);
B60Q2300/3321 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | B60Q1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Regulierungsverfahren der Leuchtstärke von Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfern | [2010/12] | English: | Method for adjusting the lighting of an automobile's headlights | [2010/12] | French: | Procédé d'ajustement de l'éclairage des projecteurs pour véhicule automobile | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2017 | 19.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2009 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | MT | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | IE | 17.09.2018 | LU | 17.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.09.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | EE | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MT | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE102007018599 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,19 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0045] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraphs [0062] , [0063] * * figures 1-8 * [A] 6,9-11,13-18 [Y] 4; | [XA]US2005152581 (HOKI KENTA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0051] * * paragraphs [0088] , [0155] , [0161] * [A] 2,11; | [XA]EP1837803 (MOBILEYE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CY]) [X] 1,5,11-16,19 * the whole document * [A] 17,18; | [Y]EP1339228 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2008169912 (KAWASAKI NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0180] - [0187] *; | [A]US6611610 (STAM JOSEPH S [US], et al) [A] 1-4,11-16,19 * column 37, line 29 - column 38, line 25 *; | [A]WO2008024639 (DONNELLY CORP [US], et al) [A] 17,18 * paragraphs [0088] , [0089] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0114] * |