EP2298639 - Mooring component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technology From Ideas Limited Unit 3b, Cleaboy Business Park Old Kilmeaden Road Waterford / IE | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEvoy, Paul 18 The Chantries Balbriggan Co. Dublin / IE | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Ramsay, Laura Anne, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Ramsay, Laura Anne, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09170681.2 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298639 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/00, B63B21/20 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B63B21/00 (EP,US);
B63B2021/005 (EP);
B63B2021/203 (EP,US);
D07B1/22 (EP,US);
D07B2401/2005 (EP,US);
D07B2501/2061 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49764 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vertäuungskomponente | [2011/12] | English: | Mooring component | [2011/12] | French: | Composant d'amarrage | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 23.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2501739 (ULLMANN MARTIN [CH]) [X] 1-5,10-13 * page 3, lines 4-33; figure - *; | [X]US4534262 (SWENSON RICHARD C [US]) [X] 1-3,5,10-13 * column 1, lines 31-39 ** column 2, lines 12-21; figure - *; | [XI]US4597351 (BRAINARD II EDWARD C [US]) [X] 1-5,10-13 * column 2, lines 25-45 * * column 3, lines 14-31; figure - * [I] 6,8,9; | [X]US2005103251 (HUANG YUN-PENG [TW]) [X] 1-6,10-13 * paragraph [0016]; figure - *; | [X]US2009202306 (HUANG YUN PENG [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * paragraph [0029]; figure - *; | [X] - Seaflex AB, "Seaflex - Product Guide, Version 1.2 (June 21 2004)", (20050426), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20050426085136/extranet.seaflex.net/Seaflex+Guide/Product+Guide+1.2.pdf, (20100305), XP002571767 [X] 1-3,5-7,10-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9627055 |