EP2165899 - A parking brake mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Jonathan 27 Grange Park Whitchurch Ross-on-Wye, HR9 6EA / GB | 02 /
Wilde, Brendan The Coombe 33 Gloucester Road Thornbury / GB | 03 /
Taylor, Martin Wesley Close Torfaen, NP44 3ND / GB | 04 /
Leiter, Ralf Im Vogelsang 5 56743, Mendig / DE | 05 /
Roberts, Paul 97 Brynglas Road Newport, NP20 5QU / GB | 06 /
Shaw, Gareth 5 Summerfield Road Stourport on Severn, Worcestershire DY13 / GB | 07 /
Thompson, Richard Little Leasbrook Leasbrook Lane Monmouth, NP25 3SH / GB | 08 /
Bell, Paul 27 Darland Road Rossett, LL12 0EL / GB | 09 /
Fieldhouse, John 1 Jessop Avenue Almondbury, HD5 8US / GB | 10 /
Knox, Gareth 174 Morland Road Splott, CF24 3LQ / GB | 11 /
El Malki, Refaat 6 Millar House Merchants Road Clifton, Bristol BS8 4HA / GB | [2015/46] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
Jackson, Jonathan 27 Grange Park Whitchurch Ross-on-Wye, HR9 6EA / GB | ||
02 /
Wilde, Brendan The Coombe 33 Gloucester Road Thornbury / GB | |||
03 /
Taylor, Martin Wesley Close Torfaen, NP44 3ND / GB | |||
04 /
Leiter, Ralf Im Vogelsang 5 56743, Mendig / DE | |||
05 /
Roberts, Paul 97 Brynglas Road Newport, NP20 5QU / GB | |||
06 /
Shaw, Gareth 5 Summerfield Road Stourport on Severn, Worcestershire DY13 / GB | |||
07 /
Thompson, Richard Little Leasbrook Leasbrook Lane Monmouth, NP25 3SH / GB | |||
08 /
Bell, Paul 27 Darland Road Rossett, LL12 0EL / GB | |||
09 /
Fieldhouse, John 1 Jessop Avenue Almondbury, HD5 8US / GB | |||
10 /
Knox, Gareth 174 Morland Road Splott, CF24 3LQ / GB | |||
11 /
El Malki, Refaat 6 Millar House Merchants Road Clifton, Bristol BS8 4HA / GB | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London Greater London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2010/12] | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09170768.7 | 18.09.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | GB20080017230 | 19.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0817230 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165899 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165899 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/04, B60T13/74, B60T17/08, F16D65/14 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B60T17/083 (EP,US);
B60T13/04 (EP,US);
B60T13/743 (EP,US);
F16D65/28 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2121/12 (EP,US);
F16D2121/20 (EP,US);
F16D2123/00 (EP,US);
F16D2127/06 (EP,US);
F16D2129/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Feststellbremsenmechanismus | [2010/12] | English: | A parking brake mechanism | [2010/12] | French: | Mécanisme de frein à main | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9948738 (MERITOR AUTOMOTIVE INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2004005099 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE], et al); | [X]DE10352030 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]); | [A]EP1930220 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]US2008217117 (SEVERINSSON LARS [SE], et al) | by applicant | EP1000263 | US6851761 | EP1596090 |