EP2169986 - Controlling the transmission timing of a multicast packet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Igarashi, Kei c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Akira c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Intellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Igarashi, Kei c/o NTT DoCoMo, IncIntellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamada, Akira c/o NTT DoCoMo, IncIntellectual Property Department Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170774.5 | 18.09.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | JP20080248435 | 26.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008248435 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2169986 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2169986 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169986 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
H04L12/1877 (EP,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Steuerung der Übertragungszeit eines Multicast-Pakets | [2010/13] | English: | Controlling the transmission timing of a multicast packet | [2010/13] | French: | Commande de la synchronisation de transmission d'un paquet de multidiffusion | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 15.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | HR | 29.08.2012 | IT | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | MK | 29.08.2012 | MT | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | SM | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | IE | 18.09.2012 | LU | 18.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 29.10.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | NO | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | DE | 03.04.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 29.08.2012 | ||
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
LU | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
DE | 03.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
LU | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
DE | 03.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
DE | 03.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
DE | 03.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
DE | 03.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
DE | 03.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 18.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005114537 (GRISWOLD VICTOR J [US], et al) [X] 1,10-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028]; claims 1-7 * * figure 3 * [Y] 2,5,6 [I] 3,4,7,9; | [A]US2005201341 (GRISWOLD VICTOR J [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] *; | [IY]US2005254444 (MEIER ROBERT C [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4,7,9-14 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0067] * * figure 3 * [Y] 2,5,6; | [I]US2007230441 (SETHI ASEEM [IN], et al) [I] 1,3,4,7,10-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2008123577 (JAAKKOLA MIKKO [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * |