EP2174808 - Method of making a sealed duct from a cab post [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruss, Paul T 723 W. 9th Street Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | 02 /
Koch, Terry S 5308 Carey Drive Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | 03 /
Wood, Robert L 2520 North Penn Avenue Independence, IA 67301 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09171472.5 | 28.09.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20080248524 | 09.10.2008 Original published format: US 248524 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2174808 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2174808 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174808 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B62D29/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP,US);
B60H1/00378 (EP,US);
B60H1/243 (EP,US);
B62D29/002 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00635 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer versiegelten Leitung aus einer Fahrerhausstange | [2010/15] | English: | Method of making a sealed duct from a cab post | [2010/15] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un conduit hermétique à partir d'un poteau mobile | [2011/11] |
Former [2010/15] | Procédé de fabrication d'un conduit hermétique à partir d'unpoteau mobile | Examination procedure | 07.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 14.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2011 | BE | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | HR | 10.08.2011 | HU | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | LT | 10.08.2011 | LV | 10.08.2011 | MK | 10.08.2011 | MT | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | SM | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | IE | 28.09.2011 | LU | 28.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | NO | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | ES | 21.11.2011 | IS | 10.12.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
SM | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
SM | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
SM | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
SM | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MK | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
BE | 10.08.2011 | ||
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
HR | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
NO | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6299206 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2004239148 (RATET FLORENCE [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016] ** figure - *; | [A]US2005082872 (RICH JONATHAN E [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030] * * figure - * |