EP2182412 - Radiation source and lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loopstra, Erik Lakenstraat 32-34 5613 ES Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Banine, Vadim Nierslaan 2 5704 NK Helmond / NL | 03 /
Swinkels, Gerardus Generaal Coenderslaan 27 5623 LT Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Buurman, Erik De Glazenmaker 62 5506 EP Veldhoven / NL | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Slenders, Petrus Johannes Waltherus, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Slenders, Petrus J. W., et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2010/18] | Slenders, Petrus J. W. ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6504 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09171960.9 | 01.10.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | US20080111149P | 04.11.2008 Original published format: US 111149 P | US20090172637P | 24.04.2009 Original published format: US 172637 P | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182412 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, H05G2/00 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/70108 (EP,US);
G03F7/70033 (EP,US);
H05G2/003 (EP,US);
H05G2/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | Strahlungsquelle und lithografische Vorrichtung | [2010/18] | English: | Radiation source and lithographic apparatus | [2010/18] | French: | Source de radiation et appareil lithographique | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 20.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6285743 (KONDO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,12,13 * abstract * * column 5, lines 47-58 * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 14 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 37 * * column 10, lines 18-51 * * column 11, lines 6-67 * * column 13, lines 33-42,61-67 *; | [XA]EP1255163 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0018] * [A] 2; | [A]US6703625 (DOROS THEODORE G [US]) [A] 1,7-13 * abstract * * column 2, lines 27-30 * * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 55 ** column 11, lines 24-58 *; | [X]FR2860385 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 35 * * page 9, lines 1-19 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 3 *; | [XA]FR2871622 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,12,13 * abstract * * page 8, lines 7-21 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 8 * * page 12, lines 5-26 * * page 13, line 30 - page 14, line 2 * * page 14, lines 27-32 * [A] 8,10; | [XA]US2006215712 (ZIENER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0074] - [0081] - [0085] * [A] 8,10 |