EP2285067 - Methods and systems for authenticating users [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daon Holdings Limited The Harbour Trust Co. Ltd, P.O. Box 1787, One Capital Place George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Conor 3806 Ruben Simpson Court Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | 02 /
Peirce, Michael 25 Oakley Court Ranelagh 6, Dublin / IE | 03 /
Cramer, Jason 1258 Dunn Meadow Court Vienna, VA 22182 / US | 04 /
Steiner, Chet 8028 Falstaff Road McLean, VA 22102 / US | 05 /
Diebes, Suzanna 45641 Paddington Station Terrace Sterling, VA Virginia 20166 / US | [2014/01] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
White, Conor 3806 Ruben Simpson Court Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | ||
02 /
Peirce, Michael 25 Oakley Court Ranelagh 6, Dublin / IE | |||
03 /
Cramer, Jason 1258 Dunn Meadow Court Vienna, VA 22182 / US | |||
04 /
Steiner, Chet 8028 Falstaff Road McLean, VA 22102 / US | |||
05 /
Diebes, Suzanna 45641 Paddington Station Terrace Sterling, VA Virginia 20166 / US | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09172150.6 | 02.10.2009 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20090535720 | 05.08.2009 Original published format: US 535720 | US20090538189 | 10.08.2009 Original published format: US 538189 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285067 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285067 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06Q20/36 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H04L63/0838 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Authentifizierung von Benutzern | [2011/07] | English: | Methods and systems for authenticating users | [2011/07] | French: | Procédés et systèmes d'authentification d'utilisateurs | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 01.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13174424.5 / EP2654264 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2009 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | ES | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MK | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | NL | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | SM | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
SM | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003163739 (ARMINGTON JOHN PHILLIP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15-21,24,25 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008]; figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * [Y] 4,9,14,22,23; | [YA]EP1172771 (KRAMER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 4,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] * [A] 1,13,25; | [Y]US2007295807 (ANTOS KENNETH M [US], et al) [Y] 9,22,23 * column A; figure 6 * * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2007169182 (WOLFOND GREGORY H [CA], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0024] * |