EP2191939 - Device for hand machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/10] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hecht, Joachim / Rossweg 12/1 71106, Magstadt / DE | 02 /
Kuespert, Klaus / Jahnstr. 83 70771, Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2012/23] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
Hecht, Joachim Rossweg 12/1 71106, Magstadt / DE | ||
02 /
Kuespert, Klaus Jahnstr. 83 70771, Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/23] | Application number, filing date | 09172208.2 | 05.10.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | DE20081044219 | 01.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008044219 | [2010/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191939 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191939 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/24 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B25D17/24 (EP);
B25D11/125 (EP);
B25D2217/0088 (EP);
B25D2217/0092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Handwerkzeugmaschinenvorrichtung | [2010/22] | English: | Device for hand machine tool | [2010/22] | French: | Dispositif pour machine-outil portable | [2012/02] |
Former [2010/22] | Dispositif pour machine-outil de main | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2009 | CY | 06.06.2012 | CZ | 06.06.2012 | DK | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | HR | 06.06.2012 | IT | 06.06.2012 | LT | 06.06.2012 | LV | 06.06.2012 | MK | 06.06.2012 | MT | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | PL | 06.06.2012 | RO | 06.06.2012 | SE | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | SM | 06.06.2012 | TR | 06.06.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | NO | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | ES | 17.09.2012 | IE | 05.10.2012 | LU | 05.10.2012 | IS | 06.10.2012 | PT | 08.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 05.10.2009 | |
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
SM | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
LU | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
SM | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
LU | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 06.06.2012 | |
NO | 06.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102006053105 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1-12 *; | [Y]DE10348397 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2004082897 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US], et al) [A] 3,5-9,12-14 * page 1, lines 12-23 * * page 12, line 23 - page 22, line 25 * * figures 1-18 * |