EP2175230 - Medicine packet inspecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/15] | Medecine packet inspecting apparatus | ||
[2011/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVM Co., Ltd. 100-23 Galsan-Dong, Dalseo-Gu Daegu 704-900 / KR | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jun-Ho 102-102 Beomeowobang Elysion, 92-2 Beomeo 4-dong, Suseong-gu Daegu 706-014 / KR | [2011/35] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Kim, Jun-Ho 102-102 Beomeowobang Elysion, 92-2 Beomeo 4-dong, Suseong-gu Daegu 706-014 / KR | Representative(s) | Kling, Simone, et al Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Kling, Simone, et al Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | Kling, Simone, et al LAVOIX Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09172224.9 | 05.10.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | KR20080098668 | 08.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080098668 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175230 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175230 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, B65B5/10, G01N21/95 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
B65B57/10 (KR);
A61J3/00 (KR);
B65B57/02 (KR);
B65H19/12 (KR);
G01N21/9508 (EP,US);
G01N2021/845 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Medikamentenpackungs-Prüfvorrichtung | [2010/15] | English: | Medicine packet inspecting apparatus | [2011/09] | French: | Appareil d'inspection de paquets de médicaments | [2010/15] |
Former [2010/15] | Medecine packet inspecting apparatus | Examination procedure | 27.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | HR | 31.08.2011 | HU | 31.08.2011 | IT | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MK | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | SM | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | IE | 05.10.2011 | LU | 05.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | NO | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
SM | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6505461 (YASUNAGA ITSUO [JP]) [I] 1-12 * column 2, lines 48-53 * * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 20 * * abstract *; | [I]WO2004072626 (DIJKSTRA VEREENIGDE BEDRIJVEN [NL], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 5, line 17 - page 9, line 27 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2005017814 (GLOBAL FACTORIES B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 30 * * page 8, lines 17-28 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1726524 (JVM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [I]WO2008033019 (DIJKSTRA VEREENIGDE BEDRIJVEN [NL], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 4, line 35 - page 8, line 22 * |